VA HB2012 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2012
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Violations of protective orders; preliminary child protective order. Changes the punishment and sentencing requirements for a violation of a preliminary child protective order so that the maximum penalty is a Class 1 misdemeanor and the court is no longer required to enter a permanent family abuse protective order (i.e., a protective order with a maximum duration of two years) upon a conviction of a violation of a preliminary child protective order. The bill provides that a violation of a preliminary child protective order is punishable as contempt of court; however, if the violation involves an act or acts of commission or omission that endanger the child's life, health, or normal development or result in bodily injury to the child, it is punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor. Under current law, violations of preliminary child protective orders constitute contempt of court and are also subject to the same penalties as violations of preliminary, emergency, and permanent family abuse protective orders, including enhanced penalties for certain violations. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference. Violations of protective orders; preliminary child protective order. Changes the punishment and sentencing requirements for a violation of a preliminary child protective order so that the maximum penalty is a Class 1 misdemeanor and the court is no longer required to enter a permanent family abuse protective order (i.e., a protective order with a maximum duration of two years) upon a conviction of a violation of a preliminary child protective order. The bill provides that a violation of a preliminary child protective order is punishable as contempt of court; however, if the violation involves an act or acts of commission or omission that endanger the child's life, health, or normal development or result in bodily injury to the child, it is punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor. Under current law, violations of preliminary child protective orders constitute contempt of court and are also subject to the same penalties as violations of preliminary, emergency, and permanent family abuse protective orders, including enhanced penalties for certain violations. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference.
Title
Protective orders; violations of preliminary child protective order, changes punishment, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 184 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2012ER) |
2021-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Printed as engrossed 21100411D-E |
2021-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2012E |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100411D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2012 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
SB1415 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
SB1415 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
SB1415 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
SB1415 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)