VA HB2010 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Earned sentence credits; revocation of suspended sentence. Clarifies that sentences for certain crimes that as of July 1, 2022, will be subject to a maximum of 4.5 earned sentence credits for each 30 days served include a suspended sentence that is revoked for any such crime. This bill is declarative of existing law. Earned sentence credits; revocation of suspended sentence. Clarifies that sentences for certain crimes that as of July 1, 2022, will be subject to a maximum of 4.5 earned sentence credits for each 30 days served include a suspended sentence that is revoked for any such crime. This bill is declarative of existing law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Earned sentence credits; rate at which sentence rates may be earned, prerequisites.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-02HousePrinted as engrossed 21102110D-E
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2010E
2021-02-02HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102110D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531202.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2010
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2010+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2010E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB2010AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2010F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2010FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08V0128+HB2010
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08V0136+HB2010
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1355+HB2010
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1417+HB2010
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S09V0043+HB2010

Bill Comments

feedback