VA HB1998 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1998

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0026)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public schools; lock-down drills; annual requirement. Reduces from three to two the minimum number of mandatory annual lock-down drills in each public elementary and secondary school in the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public schools; lock-down drills, annual requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0026)
2021-02-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 26 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 26, 2021
2021-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2021
2021-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-17SenateSigned by President
2021-02-17HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1998ER)
2021-02-17HouseEnrolled
2021-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15SenateRead third time
2021-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-11SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101496D

Same As/Similar To

HB1998 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221137.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1998
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1998+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1998ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0026+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1998F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1998FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0901C0065+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H09C0038+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1215+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0118+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0022+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0014HB1998+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0020HB1998+HB1998

Bill Comments

feedback