VA HB1998 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0027)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Exposure to bodily fluids; infection with human immunodeficiency virus or hepatitis B or C viruses; expedited testing. Requires a general district court to hold a hearing within 48 hours of a petition being filed seeking to compel collection of a blood specimen for testing for human immunodeficiency virus or the hepatitis B or C viruses when exposure to bodily fluids occurs between a person and any health care provider, person employed by or under the direction and control of a health care provider, law-enforcement officer, firefighter, emergency medical services personnel, person employed by a public safety agency, or school board employee and the person whose blood specimen is sought refuses to consent to providing such specimen. The bill directs the Office of the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia to publish a petition form for such filing. If the court is closed during the 48-hour time period, the petition shall be heard on the next day that the court is in session. The bill allows a testing order to be issued based on a finding that there is probable cause to believe that exposure has occurred. Any person who is the subject of such order may appeal to the circuit court of the same jurisdiction within 10 days of receiving notice of the order. The bill specifies that no specimen obtained as a result of a testing order shall be tested for any purpose other than for the purpose provided for in the bill, nor shall the specimen or the results of such testing be used for any purpose in any criminal matter or investigation. Any violation shall constitute reversible error in any criminal case in which the specimen or results were used.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIV or hepatitis B or C viruses; exposure to bodily fluids, infection, hearing on petition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0027)
2019-02-15 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 27 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019
2019-02-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019
2019-02-11SenateSigned by President
2019-02-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-11HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1998ER)
2019-02-11HouseEnrolled
2019-02-07HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
2019-02-07HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
2019-02-06HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-04SenateRead third time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1998H1
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104845D-H1
2019-01-24HouseRead second time
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104845D-H1
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102574D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161241(n/a)See Bill Text
32145.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1998
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1998+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1998H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1998ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0027+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0009+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0014+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1860+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0188+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0310HB1998+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0317HB1998+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2566+HB1998

Bill Comments 750

feedback