VA HB1992 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Localities; regulation of firearms in government buildings. Allows localities and authorized agents of such localities to regulate the possession of firearms, ammunition, or components or combination thereof in, or the carrying of such items into, any building owned or used by such locality for governmental purposes. The bill also removes the prohibition against a locality regulating the purchase, transfer, ownership, carrying, storage, or transporting of such items. Current law prohibits localities from adopting or enforcing any ordinance, resolution, or motion regarding firearms, ammunition, or components or combination thereof, except workplace rules relating to terms and conditions of employment of the workforce or unless such ordinance, resolution, or motion is expressly authorized by statute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Localities; regulation of firearms in government buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101997D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152915(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback