VA HB1980 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Enslaved Ancestors College Access Scholarship and Memorial Program established. Establishes the Enslaved Ancestors College Access Scholarship and Memorial Program, whereby Longwood University, the University of Virginia, Virginia Commonwealth University, the Virginia Military Institute, and The College of William and Mary in Virginia, starting in the 2022-2023 academic year and with any source of funds other than state funds or tuition or fee increases, are required to annually (i) identify and memorialize, to the extent possible, all enslaved individuals who labored on former and current institutionally controlled grounds and property and (ii) provide a tangible benefit such as a college scholarship or community-based economic development program for individuals or specific communities with a demonstrated historic connection to slavery that will empower families to be lifted out of the cycle of poverty. Enslaved Ancestors College Access Scholarship and Memorial Program established. Establishes the Enslaved Ancestors College Access Scholarship and Memorial Program, whereby Longwood University, the University of Virginia, Virginia Commonwealth University, the Virginia Military Institute, and The College of William and Mary in Virginia, starting in the 2022-2023 academic year and with any source of funds other than state funds or tuition or fee increases, are required to annually (i) identify and memorialize, to the extent possible, all enslaved individuals who labored on former and current institutionally controlled grounds and property and (ii) provide a tangible benefit such as a college scholarship or community-based economic development program for individuals or specific communities with a demonstrated historic connection to slavery that will empower families to be lifted out of the cycle of poverty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enslaved Ancestors College Access Scholarship and Memorial Program; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-04HouseVOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N)
2021-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (61-Y 39-N)
2021-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1980H1
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103782D-H1
2021-02-03HouseRead second time
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103782D-H1
2021-02-01HouseReported from Education with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102391D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231615.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1980
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1980+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1980H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103782D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103782.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1980F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1980FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0902V0016+HB1980
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H09V0052+HB1980
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1441+HB1980
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0098+HB1980

Bill Comments

feedback