VA HB1980 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1980

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0442)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Enslaved Ancestors College Access Scholarship and Memorial Program established. Establishes the Enslaved Ancestors College Access Scholarship and Memorial Program, whereby Longwood University, the University of Virginia, Virginia Commonwealth University, the Virginia Military Institute, and The College of William and Mary in Virginia, with any source of funds other than state funds or tuition or fee increases, are required to annually (i) identify and memorialize, to the extent possible, all enslaved individuals who labored on former and current institutionally controlled grounds and property and (ii) provide a tangible benefit such as a college scholarship or community-based economic development program for individuals or specific communities with a demonstrated historic connection to slavery that will empower families to be lifted out of the cycle of poverty. The bill requires the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to collaborate with such institutions to establish guidelines for the implementation of the Program and to annually collect information on the implementation of the Program from such institutions and report such information to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations, the House Committee on Education, the Senate Committee on Education and Health, the Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations, and the Virginia African American Advisory Board. Enslaved Ancestors College Access Scholarship and Memorial Program established. Establishes the Enslaved Ancestors College Access Scholarship and Memorial Program, whereby Longwood University, the University of Virginia, Virginia Commonwealth University, the Virginia Military Institute, and The College of William and Mary in Virginia, with any source of funds other than state funds or tuition or fee increases, are required to annually (i) identify and memorialize, to the extent possible, all enslaved individuals who labored on former and current institutionally controlled grounds and property and (ii) provide a tangible benefit such as a college scholarship or community-based economic development program for individuals or specific communities with a demonstrated historic connection to slavery that will empower families to be lifted out of the cycle of poverty. The bill requires the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to collaborate with such institutions to establish guidelines for the implementation of the Program and to annually collect information on the implementation of the Program from such institutions and report such information to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations, the House Committee on Education, the Senate Committee on Education and Health, the Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations, and the Virginia African American Advisory Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enslaved Ancestors College Access Scholarship and Memorial Program; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0442)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 442 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1980ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReported from Education and Health (11-Y 3-N)
2021-02-11SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-04HouseVOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N)
2021-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (61-Y 39-N)
2021-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1980H1
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103782D-H1
2021-02-03HouseRead second time
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103782D-H1
2021-02-01HouseReported from Education with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102391D

Same As/Similar To

HB1980 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231615.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1980
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1980+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1980H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1980ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0442+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1980F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1980FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1980FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0902C0016+HB1980
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H09C0052+HB1980
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1441+HB1980
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0098+HB1980
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0038+HB1980
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB1980+HB1980
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0276HB1980+HB1980

Bill Comments

feedback