VA HB1965 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1965

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State Air Pollution Control Board; low-emissions and zero-emissions vehicle program. Directs the State Air Pollution Control Board to implement a low-emissions and zero-emissions vehicle program for motor vehicles with a model year of 2025 and later. Regulations adopted by the Board to implement the program are exempt from the Administrative Process Act and shall not become effective prior to January 1, 2024. The bill requires that the regulations adopted by the Board will allow any motor vehicle manufacturer to establish a Virginia-specific zero-emission vehicle credit account and to make an initial deposit into its account. Such credits may be traded or sold or used to meet up to 18 percent of the manufacturer's zero-emissions vehicle program credit requirements in any model year. The bill also authorizes the State Corporation Commission to exclude sales related to such vehicles from certain energy efficiency calculations. State Air Pollution Control Board; low-emissions and zero-emissions vehicle program. Directs the State Air Pollution Control Board to implement a low-emissions and zero-emissions vehicle program for motor vehicles with a model year of 2025 and later. Regulations adopted by the Board to implement the program are exempt from the Administrative Process Act and shall not become effective prior to January 1, 2024. The bill requires that the regulations adopted by the Board will allow any motor vehicle manufacturer to establish a Virginia-specific zero-emission vehicle credit account and to make an initial deposit into its account. Such credits may be traded or sold or used to meet up to 18 percent of the manufacturer's zero-emissions vehicle program credit requirements in any model year. The bill also authorizes the State Corporation Commission to exclude sales related to such vehicles from certain energy efficiency calculations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Air Pollution Control Board; low-emissions and zero-emissions vehicle program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 15-N) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Newman rejected (18-Y 20-N) (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 263 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1965ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-23HouseVOTE: Adoption (53-Y 44-N)
2021-02-23HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (53-Y 44-N)
2021-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-19SenatePassed Senate with amendments (21-Y 15-N)
2021-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2021-02-19SenateAmendments by Senator Newman rejected (18-Y 20-N)
2021-02-19SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-19SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-19SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-19SenateRead third time
2021-02-18SenatePassed by for the day
2021-02-18SenateRead third time
2021-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (11-Y 4-N)
2021-02-10SenateAssigned C&L sub: Energy
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
2021-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 21101651D-E
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1965E
2021-01-29HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101651D

Same As/Similar To

HB1965 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011307(n/a)See Bill Text
1011307.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1965
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1965+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1965E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1965ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0263+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1965AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200080A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1965AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1965ASE
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1965ASR
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1965F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1965FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1965FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H01C0044+HB1965
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1297+HB1965
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02C0092+HB1965
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02V0018+HB1965
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0113HB1965+HB1965
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0209HB1965+HB1965
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0210HB1965+HB1965
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1877+HB1965

Bill Comments

feedback