VA HB1965 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State Air Pollution Control Board; low-emissions and zero-emissions vehicle program. Directs the State Air Pollution Control Board to implement a low-emissions and zero-emissions vehicle program for motor vehicles with a model year of 2025 and later. Regulations adopted by the Board to implement the program are exempt from the Administrative Process Act and shall not become effective prior to January 1, 2024. The bill also authorizes the State Corporation Commission to exclude sales related to such vehicles from certain energy efficiency calculations. State Air Pollution Control Board; low-emissions and zero-emissions vehicle program. Directs the State Air Pollution Control Board to implement a low-emissions and zero-emissions vehicle program for motor vehicles with a model year of 2025 and later. Regulations adopted by the Board to implement the program are exempt from the Administrative Process Act and shall not become effective prior to January 1, 2024. The bill also authorizes the State Corporation Commission to exclude sales related to such vehicles from certain energy efficiency calculations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Air Pollution Control Board; low-emissions and zero-emissions vehicle program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
2021-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 21101651D-E
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1965E
2021-01-29HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101651D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011307(n/a)See Bill Text
1011307.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1965
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1965+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1965E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1965AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103767A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1965F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1965FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H01V0044+HB1965
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1297+HB1965
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S01V0068+HB1965
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S02V0092+HB1965

Bill Comments

feedback