VA HB1959 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Worker retraining tax credit; student internships; College Savings Plan contributions. Provides a $1,000 tax credit to an employer for each intern hired as part of a qualified internship program. The bill defines "qualified internship program" as an internship in which the student works at least 20 hours per week for at least 10 weeks; the intern receives at least minimum wage; the intern receives training that enhances job-related skills; and such training is in the field of electrical work, engineering, manufacturing, or mechanical work. An employer would be required to obtain approval of its internship program from a school division or community college of the Commonwealth and the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity. The bill also provides a credit of 30 percent of the value of any matching contribution made by the employer, up to $1,000, for a student intern's contribution to his Virginia College Savings Plan.
Title
Student internships; tax credit to an employer for each intern hired.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Finance |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100494D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1959 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1959+hil |