VA HB1959 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; required reports on intellectual property and externally sponsored research. Requires each public institution of higher education to include in its six-year plan the following for the most recently ended fiscal year: (i) the assignment during the year of any intellectual property interests to a person or nongovernmental entity by the institution or any related entity, (ii) the value of externally sponsored research funds received during the year from a person or nongovernmental entity by the institution or any related entity, and (iii) the number and types of patents awarded during the year to the institution or any related entity that were developed in whole or part from externally sponsored research provided by a person or nongovernmental entity.
Title
Higher educational institutions; information for six-year plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N) (Y: 3 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 1-N) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N) (Y: 3 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 1-N) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 579 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1959ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Conference substitute printed 15105458D-H1 |
2015-02-25 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senators: McWaters, Garrett, Petersen |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Delegates: Toscano, Cox, Massie |
2015-02-24 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-24 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15105047D-S1 (3-Y 95-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-18 | House | Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105047D-S1 (89-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1959S1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105047D-S1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105047D-S1 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103344D-E |
2015-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1959E |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103344D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1206 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580)