VA SB1206 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; required reports on intellectual property and externally sponsored research. Requires each public institution of higher education to include in its six-year plan the following for the most recently ended fiscal year: (i) the assignment during the year of any intellectual property interests to a person or nongovernmental entity by the institution or any related entity, (ii) the value of externally sponsored research funds received during the year from a person or nongovernmental entity by the institution or any related entity, and (iii) the number and types of patents awarded during the year to the institution or any related entity that were developed in whole or part from externally sponsored research provided by a person or nongovernmental entity.
Title
Higher educational institutions; six-year plan to include intellectual property interests, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0580) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 580 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1206ER) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Title replaced 15105300D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB1206H2 |
2015-02-20 | House | Substitute by Delegate Massie agreed to 15105300D-H2 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee substitute rejected 15105038D-H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee substitute reconsidered |
2015-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | House | Floor substitute printed 15105300D-H2 (Massie) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-18 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House with substitute (99-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1206H1 |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105038D-H1 |
2015-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105038D-H1 |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1206S1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104806D-S1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104806D-S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101976D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1959 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)