VA HB1944 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 25, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Civil actions; no-fault divorce; fees and costs. Provides that, in the case of a no-fault divorce proceeding, there is a presumption that a party to the case who is the recipient of a state or federally funded public assistance program for the indigent is unable to pay the fees or costs. The bill further provides that, in such no-fault divorce proceeding, such person shall certify to the receipt of such benefits under oath.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil actions; determination of indigency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 25, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1944ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106545D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1944S1
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106545D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106545D-S1
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1944H1
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105765D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105765D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101359D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171606(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1944
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1944+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1944H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1944S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1944ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0052+HB1944
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0055+HB1944
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2066+HB1944
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0223+HB1944
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB1944+HB1944
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB1944+HB1944
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2788+HB1944

Bill Comments

feedback