VA HB1936 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Derelict and blighted buildings; land banks; receivership. Authorizes a locality to petition the circuit court to appoint a land bank entity to act as a receiver in certain limited circumstances to repair derelict and blighted buildings that contain residential dwelling units.
Title
Derelict and blighted buildings; land banks, receivership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 381 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1936ER) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102899D |