VA HB1934 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
In-state tuition; undocumented persons. Establishes that an undocumented person who is unlawfully present in the United States shall not be eligible for in-state tuition unless he meets all of the following criteria: (i) he has resided with his parent, guardian, or other person standing in loco parentis while attending a public or private high school in the Commonwealth; (ii) he has graduated from a public or private high school in the Commonwealth or has received a General Education Development (GED) certificate in the Commonwealth; (iii) he has registered as an entering student in an institution of higher education in the Commonwealth; (iv) he has resided in the Commonwealth for at least three years immediately preceding his registration as an entering student in an institution of higher education in the Commonwealth or for one year if he is a veteran or an active duty member of the United States armed forces; (v) he has provided an affidavit to the institution stating that he has filed an application to become a permanent resident of the United States and is actively pursuing such permanent residency or will do so as soon as he is eligible; and (vi) he has submitted evidence that he or, in the case of a dependent student, at least one parent, guardian, or person standing in loco parentis, has filed, unless exempted by state law, Virginia income tax returns for at least three years prior to the date of enrollment.
Title
Tuition, in-state; undocumented persons to meet certain criteria.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2013-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1525-Rust) by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100693D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1934 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1934+hil |