VA HB1931 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fare enforcement inspectors. Provides for the appointment of fare enforcement inspectors to enforce payment of fares for use of mass transit facilities operated anywhere in the Commonwealth. Currently, fare enforcement inspectors may be appointed only in Planning District 8 (Northern Virginia). Under current law, failure of a transit user to pay the fare or produce proof of fare payment to such fare enforcement inspectors carries a civil penalty of not more than $100. This bill is identical to SB 1172.
Title
Fare enforcement inspectors; enforcement of payment of fares for use of mass transit facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 4-N) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0070) | |
2017-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 70 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1931ER) |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-10 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (91-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (27-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (33-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100410D |