VA HB1929 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School Equity and Staffing Act; Standards School Equity and Staffing Act; Standards of Quality; work-based learning; teacher leaders and mentors; principal mentors; certain personnel positions and initiatives. Makes several changes to the Standards of Quality, including requiring the establishment of units in the Department of Education to oversee work-based learning and principal mentorship statewide in Standard 1 and requiring the Board of Education to establish and oversee the local implementation of teacher leader and teacher mentor programs in Standard 5. The bill also makes several changes relating to school personnel in Standard 2, including (i) establishing schoolwide ratios of students to teachers in certain schools with high concentrations of poverty and granting flexibility to provide compensation adjustments to teachers in such schools; (ii) requiring each school board to assign licensed personnel in a manner that provides an equitable distribution of experienced, effective teachers and other personnel among all schools in the local school division; (iii) requiring each school board to employ teacher leaders and teacher mentors at specified student-to-position ratios; (iv) requiring state funding in addition to basic aid to support at-risk students and granting flexibility in the use of such funds by school boards; (v) lowering the ratio of English language learner students to teachers; (vi) requiring each school board to employ reading specialists and establishing a student-to-position ratio for such specialists; (vii) requiring school boards to employ one full-time principal in each elementary school; (viii) lowering the ratio of students to assistant principals and school counselors in elementary, middle, and high schools; and (ix) requiring each school board to provide at least four specialized student support positions, including school social workers, school psychologists, school nurses, licensed behavior analysts, licensed assistant behavior analysts, and other licensed health and behavioral positions, per 1,000 students.
Title
Standards of Quality; work-based learning and principal mentorship, teacher leaders and mentors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2021-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101610D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 129 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 199.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 274 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 274.01:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 294 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 299.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 617 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |