VA HB1926 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1926
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Central Virginia Transportation Authority; membership. Adds the Executive Director of the Virginia Port Authority, or his designee, as a nonvoting ex officio member of the Central Virginia Transportation Authority.
Title
Central Virginia Transportation Authority; membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0142) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 142 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1926ER) |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2021-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102105D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1926 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)