VA HB1913 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1913

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Programs to address career fatigue and wellness in certain health care providers; civil immunity; emergency. Expands civil immunity for health care professionals serving as members of or consultants to entities that function primarily to review, evaluate, or make recommendations related to health care services to include health care professionals serving as members of or consultants to entities that function primarily to address issues related to career fatigue and wellness in health care professionals licensed, registered, or certified by the Boards of Medicine, Nursing, or Pharmacy, or in students enrolled in a school of medicine, osteopathic medicine, nursing, or pharmacy located in the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Career fatigue and wellness in certain health care providers; programs to address, civil immunity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
2021-02-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 5 (effective 2/25/21)
2021-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 26, 2021
2021-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2021
2021-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-17SenateSigned by President
2021-02-17HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1913ER)
2021-02-17HouseEnrolled
2021-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15SenateRead third time
2021-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-11SenateReported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-22HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21101116D

Same As/Similar To

HB1913 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
SB1205 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)
SB1205 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412400.6(n/a)See Bill Text
5412909(n/a)See Bill Text
801581.16(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1913
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1913+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1913ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0005+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1913F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1913FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12C0054+HB1913
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1122+HB1913
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0099+HB1913
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0003+HB1913
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0014HB1913+HB1913
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0020HB1913+HB1913

Bill Comments

feedback