VA SB1205 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1205

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Programs to address career fatigue and wellness in certain health care providers; civil immunity; emergency. Expands civil immunity for health care professionals serving as members of or consultants to entities that function primarily to review, evaluate, or make recommendations related to health care services to include health care professionals serving as members of or consultants to entities that function primarily to address issues related to career fatigue and wellness in health care professionals licensed, registered, or certified by the Boards of Medicine, Nursing, or Pharmacy, or in students enrolled in a school of medicine, osteopathic medicine, nursing, or pharmacy located in the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Career fatigue and wellness in certain health care providers; programs to address, civil immunity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 243 (effective 3/18/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1205ER)
2021-02-19SenateEnrolled
2021-02-16HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HouseRead third time
2021-02-15HouseRead second time
2021-02-11HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-13SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21101126D

Same As/Similar To

SB1205 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
HB1913 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
HB1913 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412400.6(n/a)See Bill Text
5412909(n/a)See Bill Text
801581.16(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1205
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1205+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1205ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0243+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1205F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1205FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0055+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0080SB1205+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0120SB1205+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12V0001+SB1205
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1586+SB1205

Bill Comments

feedback