VA HB1904 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1904

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Teachers and other licensed school board employees; cultural competency. Requires teacher, principal, and division superintendent evaluations to include an evaluation of cultural competency. The bill requires every person seeking initial licensure or renewal of a license from the Board of Education (i) to complete instruction or training in cultural competency and (ii) with an endorsement in history and social sciences to complete instruction in African American history, as prescribed by the Board. The bill also requires each school board to adopt and implement policies that require each teacher and any other school board employee holding a license issued by the Board to complete cultural competency training, in accordance with guidance issued by the Board, at least every two years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers and other licensed school board employees; cultural competency training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
2021-02-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 23 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 26, 2021
2021-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2021
2021-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-17SenateSigned by President
2021-02-17HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1904ER)
2021-02-17HouseEnrolled
2021-02-15SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2021-02-15SenateRead third time
2021-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-11SenateReported from Education and Health (8-Y 6-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-21HouseVOTE: Passage (59-Y 41-N)
2021-01-21HouseRead third time and passed House (59-Y 41-N)
2021-01-20HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-19HouseRead first time
2021-01-18HouseReported from Education (15-Y 6-N)
2021-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101996D

Same As/Similar To

HB1904 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
SB1196 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
SB1196 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:5(n/a)See Bill Text
221298.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221298.7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1904
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1904+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1904ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0023+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1904F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1904FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0901C0054+HB1904
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H09C0023+HB1904
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC0992+HB1904
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0094+HB1904
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0009+HB1904
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0014HB1904+HB1904
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0033HB1904+HB1904

Bill Comments

feedback