VA HB1896 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
School health services. Mandates that each school board employ nurses or contract with local health departments for nursing services in order to have a ratio of one nurse per 1,000 students.
Title
School health services; school board to employ nurses to have ratio of one nurse per 1,000 students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Education | |
2011-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: #2 Students and Daycare | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101487D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1896 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1896+hil |