VA HB1882 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility for in-state tuition; certain individuals who have applied for permanent residency. Declares eligible for in-state tuition any individual who (i) graduated from a public or private high school or program of home instruction in the Commonwealth or passed a high school equivalency examination approved by the Board of Education; (ii) registers as an entering student or is enrolled in a public institution of higher education; (iii) has submitted evidence that he or, in the case of a dependent student, at least one parent, guardian, or person standing in loco parentis has filed, unless exempted by state law, Virginia income tax returns for at least one year prior to the date of registration or enrollment; and (iv) provides an affidavit to the public institution of higher education in which he has registered as an entering student or is enrolled stating that he has filed an application to become a permanent resident of the United States and is actively pursuing such permanent residency or will do so as soon as he becomes eligible for such permanent residency.
Title
In-state tuition; eligibility, certain individuals who have applied for permanent residency.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] |
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101942D |