VA HB1881 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
University of Virginia Board of Visitors; composition. Adds two members to the University of Virginia Board of Visitors: one member of the faculty senate, nominated by the faculty senate and approved by the remainder of the board, and one currently enrolled student, nominated by the dean of students and approved by the remainder of the board.
Title
University of Virginia; appointment to Board of Visitors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2013-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101742D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1881 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1881+hil |