VA HB1881 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Composite index of local ability to pay. Provides that a locality whose composite index exceeds 0.6750 must be considered as having an index of 0.6750 for purposes of distributing all payments based on the composite index.
Title
Composite index of local ability to pay; cap.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Elementary and Secondary | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101692D |