VA HB1853 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Number of judges; 21st Judicial Circuit; Martinsville, Henry and Patrick. Increases the maximum number of circuit court judges in the 21st Judicial Circuit (Martinsville, and Henry and Patrick Counties) from two to three.
Title
Number of judges; increases number in 21st Judicial District.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101488D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1853 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1853+hil |