VA HB1852 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Civil commitment of sexually violent predators; petition for release; procedures. Provides that when a petition for release of a sexually violent predator who has been civilly committed has been made by the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, no further evaluation of the committed respondent shall be required unless otherwise deemed necessary by the court. Under current law, if the Commissioner's recommendation is to release the committed respondent, such respondent's condition and need for secure inpatient treatment shall be evaluated by a second person with certain credentials to make such evaluations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil commitment of sexually violent predators; petition for release, procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-02HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100857D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372911(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback