VA HB1849 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0086)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0086)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Practice of dental hygiene; remote supervision; employment or supervision by Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; report. Allows a dental hygienist employed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (the Department) to practice under the remote supervision of a dentist employed by the Department or the Department of Health. Under current law, only a dental hygienist or dentist employed by the Virginia Department of Health may practice or supervise remotely. The bill also adds mobile dentistry programs operated by the Department for adults with developmental disabilities to the list of locations where a dental hygienist may practice under the remote supervision of a licensed dentist and directs the Department to annually submit a report of services provided by such dental hygienists to the Secretary of Health and Human Resources. The bill directs the Board of Dentistry to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Dental hygienist; remote supervision of a dentist employed by DBHDS.
Sponsors
Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0086) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 86 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1849ER) |
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1849H1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104928D-H1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104928D-H1 |
2019-01-15 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102514D |