VA HB1843 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Driver privilege cards; penalty. Authorizes the Driver privilege cards; penalty. Authorizes the issuance of new driver privilege cards by the Department of Motor Vehicles to an applicant who (i) has reported income from Virginia sources on an individual tax return filed with the Commonwealth in the preceding 12 months; (ii) is not in violation of the insurance requirements for the registration of an uninsured motor vehicle; and (iii) provides an unexpired passport as proof of identity. The bill provides that driver privilege cards shall confer the same privileges and shall be subject to the same provisions as driver's licenses and permits; however, driver privilege cards shall not (a) confer voting privileges, (b) permit an individual to waive any part of the driver examination, or (c) have their issuance be contingent upon the applicant's ability to produce proof of legal presence in the United States. The bill provides for the term "driver's license" to consistently refer to all driver's licenses, permits, driver privilege cards, and special identification cards issued by the Commonwealth or the comparable law of another jurisdiction. The bill allows the issuance of a limited-duration driver's license and special identification card to an applicant presenting valid documentary evidence that a federal court or federal agency having jurisdiction over immigration has authorized the applicant to be in the United States for a period of at least 30 days from the date of application. The bill authorizes the Tax Commissioner to provide to the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles information sufficient to verify that an applicant for a driver privilege card or permit reported income from Virginia sources on an individual tax return filed with the Commonwealth in the preceding 12 months. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1,
Title
Driver privilege cards; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101370D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1 | 19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 69.40:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 293 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 268.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 258.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3808.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 410.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 411.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 643 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 291.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 328.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 328.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 332 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 333.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 335 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 442 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 443.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1916 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1941 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 420.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |