VA HB1838 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1838
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Loudoun County school board; staggered terms. Enables the Loudoun County school board to stagger the terms of its members at the November election immediately preceding the end of the board's term and upon the board's prior vote for staggered terms.
Title
Loudoun County school board; staggered terms of its members.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0166) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 166 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1838ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100857D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1838 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)