VA HB1838 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Loudoun County school board; staggered terms. Enables the Loudoun County school board to stagger the terms of its members at the November election immediately preceding the end of the board's term and upon the board's prior vote for staggered terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Loudoun County school board; staggered terms of its members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-25HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-21HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100857D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22157.3:1.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback