VA HB1828 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Pollution Abatement Permit; inspection requirements. Removes the rule that the Department of Environmental Quality must inspect all facilities covered by a Virginia Pollution Abatement Permit annually for confined animal feeding operations or at least once every five years for all others. The bill sets a new standard that all facilities should be inspected to ensure compliance with statutory, regulatory, and permit requirements.
Title
Virginia Pollution Abatement Permit; inspection requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 101 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1828ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-31 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-26 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101519D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1298 (Same As) 2011-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)