VA HB1821 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Arrest and prosecution when experiencing or reporting overdoses. Prohibits the arrest or prosecution of an individual for the unlawful purchase, possession, or consumption of alcohol, possession of a controlled substance, possession of marijuana, intoxication in public, or possession of controlled paraphernalia if (i) such individual, in good faith, renders emergency care or assistance, including cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR) or the administration of naloxone or other opioid antagonist for overdose reversal, to an individual experiencing an overdose while another individual seeks or obtains emergency medical attention; (ii) such individual remains at the scene of the overdose or at any location to which he or the individual requiring emergency medical attention has been transported; (iii) such individual identifies himself to the law-enforcement officer who responds; and (iv) the evidence for a prosecution of one of the enumerated offenses would have been obtained only as a result of the individual's rendering emergency care or assistance. Arrest and prosecution when experiencing or reporting overdoses. Prohibits the arrest or prosecution of an individual for the unlawful purchase, possession, or consumption of alcohol, possession of a controlled substance, possession of marijuana, intoxication in public, or possession of controlled paraphernalia if (i) such individual, in good faith, renders emergency care or assistance, including cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR) or the administration of naloxone or other opioid antagonist for overdose reversal, to an individual experiencing an overdose while another individual seeks or obtains emergency medical attention; (ii) such individual remains at the scene of the overdose or at any location to which he or the individual requiring emergency medical attention has been transported; (iii) such individual identifies himself to the law-enforcement officer who responds; and (iv) the evidence for a prosecution of one of the enumerated offenses would have been obtained only as a result of the individual's rendering emergency care or assistance. Current law prohibits arrest or prosecution for such offenses only to an individual who seeks or obtains emergency medical attention for himself or another individual or who is experiencing an overdose when another individual seeks or obtains emergency medical attention for him.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Experiencing or reporting overdoses; prohibits arrest and prosecution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 13-N) (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-25HouseVOTE: Passage (87-Y 13-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House (87-Y 13-N)
2021-01-22HousePrinted as engrossed 21102028D-E
2021-01-22HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1821E
2021-01-22HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-22HouseRead second time
2021-01-21HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (19-Y 3-N)
2021-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2021-01-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102028D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182251.03(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1821
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1821+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1821E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1821AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1821F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1821FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0801V0003+HB1821
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0801V0009+HB1821
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08V0069+HB1821
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1040+HB1821
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03V0157+HB1821

Bill Comments

feedback