VA HB1808 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1808
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; reports to designated protection and advocacy system. Adds reports of serious incidents, injuries, and illnesses to be reported to the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services by providers of children's residential services licensed by the Department and reports of allegations of abuse or neglect of an individual receiving services in programs operated or licensed by the Department to the list of reports that the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services must provide to the Director of the Commonwealth's designated protection and advocacy system. The bill establishes timelines for the submission of those and other required reports. Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; reports to designated protection and advocacy system. Adds reports of serious incidents, injuries, and illnesses to be reported to the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services by providers of children's residential services licensed by the Department and reports of allegations of abuse or neglect of an individual receiving services in programs operated or licensed by the Department to the list of reports that the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services must provide to the Director of the Commonwealth's designated protection and advocacy system. The bill establishes timelines for the submission of those and other required reports.
Title
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Commissioner of; reports to designated protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-19 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1808H1 |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossment reconsidered by House |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1808H1 |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103010D-H1 |
2021-01-18 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103010D-H1 |
2021-01-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102453D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1808 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)