VA HB1792 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Employment; covenants not to compete; low-wage employees. Prohibits an employer from entering into a covenant not to compete with any of its low-wage employees. The measure declares that covenants not to compete entered into by an employer and a low-wage employee are contrary to public policy and are void and unenforceable. The measure defines a low-wage employee as one whose average weekly earnings are less than the average weekly wage of the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment; covenants not to compete, low-wage employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-27HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-12-27HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101929D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.7:7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback