VA HB1790 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1790
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; severe weather conditions and other emergency situations; unscheduled remote learning days. Provides that when severe weather conditions or other emergency situations have resulted in the closing of any school in a school division for in-person instruction, the school division may declare an unscheduled remote learning day whereby the school provides instruction and student services, consistent with guidelines established by the Department of Education to ensure the equitable provision of such services, without a reduction in the amount paid by the Commonwealth from the Basic School Aid Fund. The bill prohibits any school division from claiming more than 10 unscheduled remote learning days in a school year unless the Superintendent of Public Instruction grants an extension. Public schools; severe weather conditions and other emergency situations; unscheduled remote learning days. Provides that when severe weather conditions or other emergency situations have resulted in the closing of any school in a school division for in-person instruction, the school division may declare an unscheduled remote learning day whereby the school provides instruction and student services, consistent with guidelines established by the Department of Education to ensure the equitable provision of such services, without a reduction in the amount paid by the Commonwealth from the Basic School Aid Fund. The bill prohibits any school division from claiming more than 10 unscheduled remote learning days in a school year unless the Superintendent of Public Instruction grants an extension.
Title
Public schools; severe weather conditions and other emergency situations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (75-Y 25-N) (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 23-N) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (75-Y 25-N) (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 23-N) (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (75-Y 25-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Passed House (75-Y 25-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (77-Y 23-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (77-Y 23-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-20 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101395D-E |
2021-01-20 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1790E |
2021-01-20 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-01-20 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-18 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2021-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101395D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1790 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)