VA HB179 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0284)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0284)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recounts; procedure for certain ballots. Requires recount officials to segregate all ballots for which there is a question regarding the ballot's validity prior to the conclusion of the recount of each precinct. The bill provides that the recount court may not consider the validity of any ballots not set aside prior to the conclusion of the recount of each precinct.
Title
Recounts; procedure for certain ballots.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0284) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 284 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB179ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101013D |