VA HB1788 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-14 - Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Public Records Act; implementation in local school divisions; recommendations. Requires the Public School Records Consortium and the Records Oversight Committee to confer with school boards and division superintendents and submit to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health no later than November 1, 2019, recommendations on ways in which school boards and school board employees can better promote efficiency and cost-effectiveness in the implementation of the Virginia Public Records Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Public Records Act; implementation in local school divisions, recommendations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-12-27HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-12-27HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101759D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback