VA HB1786 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0182)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0182)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles on sidewalks. Clarifies that any public entity may allow "other power-driven mobility devices," as defined in the bill, to be ridden or driven on sidewalks in accordance with the Americans with Disabilities Act and other state and federal laws.
Title
Vehicles on sidewalks; use of power-driven mobility devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0182) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 182 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1786ER) |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1786H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19103919D-H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 19103919D-H1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100682D |