VA HB1757 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0742)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Wetlands mitigation bank. Establishes a special nonreverting fund known as the Wetland and Stream Replacement Fund to receive moneys paid to the State Water Control Board for mitigation of any impacts that a project may have on wetlands. The moneys in the fund are to be disbursed to purchase mitigation bank credits, if available within three years. If no credits are available within the three-year period, other actions are stipulated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wetland and Stream Replacement Fund; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 13-N) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0742)
2013-04-03 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 742 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2013-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2013-04-03HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1757ER2)
2013-04-03HouseReenrolled
2013-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2013-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2013-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 13-N)
2013-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (83-Y 13-N)
2013-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-03-25HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2013-02-19SenateSigned by President
2013-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-02-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1757ER)
2013-02-18HouseEnrolled
2013-02-12SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-12SenateRead third time
2013-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2013-02-07SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
2013-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2013-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2013-01-28HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N)
2013-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House (86-Y 13-N)
2013-01-25HousePrinted as engrossed 13104182D-EH1
2013-01-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1757EH1
2013-01-25HouseAmendment by Delegate Scott, E. T. agreed to
2013-01-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 13104182D-H1
2013-01-25HouseRead second time
2013-01-24HouseRead first time
2013-01-23HouseCommittee substitute printed 13104182D-H1
2013-01-23HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2013-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N)
2013-01-14HouseAssigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake
2013-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2013-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103326D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62144.15:21(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:24(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1757
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1757+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1757H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1757EH1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1757ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1757ER2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+CHAP0742+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H0103V0006+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H01V0037+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV0306+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S01V0049+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0449HB1757+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0462HB1757+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV1350+HB1757
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV1014HB1757+HB1757

Bill Comments 750

feedback