VA HB1752 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Golf carts and utility vehicles; Town of Smithfield. Authorizes the governing body of the Town of Smithfield to, by ordinance, authorize a golf cart or utility vehicle to be operated on a designated public highway where the posted speed limit is 35 miles per hour or less. The bill authorizes a golf cart or utility vehicle in the Town of Smithfield to cross any highway marked as a golf cart crossing by the Department of Transportation.
Title
Golf carts and utility vehicles; operation of vehicles on public highways in Town of Smithfield .
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred from Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2020-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-12-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100675D |