VA HB1734 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety; threat assessment; case management tool. Requires the Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety to develop a case management tool for use by public elementary and secondary school threat assessment teams and requires such threat assessment teams to use such tool to collect and report to the Center quantitative data on its activities. This bill is identical to SB 1213.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School and Campus Safety, Virginia Center for; threat assessment, case management tool.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 456 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1734ER)
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-17HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-10HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-19HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-12-19HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100594D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22179.4(n/a)See Bill Text
91184(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1734
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1734+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1734ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0456+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1101V0001+HB1734
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0031+HB1734
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0207V0007+HB1734
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0018+HB1734
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2305+HB1734
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0231+HB1734
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB1734+HB1734
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB1734+HB1734

Bill Comments

feedback