VA HB1695 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Powers and duties of health regulatory boards; health care practitioners with mental illness. Prohibits health regulatory boards from revoking, suspending, restricting, or refusing to issue or renew a registration, certificate, license, or multistate licensure privilege or otherwise discipline a health care practitioner, including a holder of a multistate licensure privileged to practice nursing, solely on the grounds that the health care practitioner has mental illness absent evidence indicating that the health care practitioner's mental illness renders the health care practitioner unable to practice with reasonable skill and safety to patients.
Title
Health regulatory boards; powers and duties, health care practitioners with mental illness.
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Yost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102248D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1695 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1695+hil |