VA HB1669 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Landlord and tenant; charge for late payment of rent; restrictions. Provides that a landlord may not charge a tenant for late payment of rent unless such charge is provided for in the written rental agreement and that no such late charge shall exceed the lesser of 10 percent of the periodic rent or 10 percent of the remaining balance due. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Landlord and tenant; charge for late payment of rent, restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Incorporated by General Laws |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1420-Bourne) by voice vote |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105446D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1420 (Similar To) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1231)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1669 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1669+hil |