VA HB1420 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1231)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Landlord and tenant; charge for late payment of rent; restrictions. Provides that a landlord shall not charge a tenant for late payment of rent unless such charge is provided for in the written rental agreement, and that no such late charge shall exceed the lesser of 10 percent of the periodic rent or 10 percent of the remaining balance due and owed by the tenant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord and tenant; charge for late payment of rent, restrictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (68-Y 26-N) (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 20-N) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1231)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1231 (effective 4/22/20)
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1420ER2)
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22 Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 6-N)
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (68-Y 26-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (68-Y 26-N)
2020-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-04-11HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-06HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1420ER)
2020-03-06HouseEnrolled
2020-03-03SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2020-03-03SenateRead third time
2020-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 1-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (80-Y 20-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (80-Y 20-N)
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1420H1
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107394D-H1
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-04HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
2020-02-04HouseIncorporates HB1669 (Collins)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107394D-H1
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102897D

Same As/Similar To

HB1669 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by General Laws

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511204(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1420&201+sum+HB1420
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1420+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1420H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1420ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1420ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1231+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0050+HB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0077+HB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0246+HB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0570+HB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0225+HB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1388HB1420+HB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1468HB1420+HB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2036HB1420+HB1420
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2150+HB1420

Bill Comments

feedback