VA HB1665 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Court-established community service programs; community service work in lieu of payment of fine or costs. Requires courts to provide an option to any person upon whom a fine and costs have been imposed to discharge all or part of the fine or costs by earning credits for the performance of community service work before or after imprisonment. Under current law, providing this option is discretionary.
Title
Court-established community service programs; community service work in lieu of pymt. of fine, etc.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102120D |