VA HB1664 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0133)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0133)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's Blue Catfish Processing, Flash Freezing, and Infrastructure Grant Program. Establishes the Governor's Blue Catfish Processing, Flash Freezing, and Infrastructure Grant Program and authorizes the Governor to award grants to political subdivisions from the Governor's Agriculture and Forestry Industries Development Fund as part of the Program. Such grants, in amounts up to $250,000, shall be awarded as reimbursable grants to support blue catfish processing, flash freezing, and infrastructure projects. The bill directs the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry to develop certain guidelines as provided in the bill on behalf of the Governor to facilitate the Program.
Title
Blue Catfish Processing, Flash Freezing, and Infrastructure Grant Program; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 8-N) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 8-N) (Y: 92 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0133) | |
2023-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 133 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1664ER) |
2023-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (92-Y 8-N) |
2023-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 8-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1664H1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105060D-H1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105060D-H1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2023-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-18 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2023-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101986D |
Same As/Similar To
SB897 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0134)
SB897 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0134)
SB897 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0134)