VA HB1654 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage. Increases the minimum wage from its current federally mandated level of $7.25 per hour to $8.00 per hour effective July 1, 2015, to $9.00 per hour effective July 1, 2016, and to $10.00 per hour effective July 1, 2017, unless a higher minimum wage is required by the federal Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA).
Title
Minimum wage; increases from its current federally mandated level to $8.00 per hour.
Sponsors
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Michael Futrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-27 | House | Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100682D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1654 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1654+hil |