VA HB1649 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Herndon. Amends the town's boundary description and reflects the town's change of municipal elections from May to November.
Title
Charter; Town of Herndon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-06 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102235D |