VA HB1642 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0845)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0845)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Coal ash ponds; well monitoring program; well testing. Requires each utility, defined in the bill as the owner or operator of a coal ash pond in the Chesapeake Bay watershed, to commission an independent well water test on behalf of the owner of any private well or public water supply well located within 1.5 miles of such coal ash pond by January 1, 2021, and requires such test to be conducted once per year during each of the five years following the approval of the closure of the coal ash pond and once every five years thereafter. The bill provides that if any test exceeds any U.S. Environmental Protection Agency Maximum Contaminant Level for drinking water, the utility shall provide water treatment or alternative water supplies, potentially including a connection to a city or county water utility, to the owner of the well.
Title
Coal ash ponds; definitions, well monitoring program, wells near ponds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (77-Y 21-N) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (75-Y 23-N) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (75-Y 23-N) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0845) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 845 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1642ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | House | VOTE: Adoption (77-Y 21-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108948D-S1 (77-Y 21-N) |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 7-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 8-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1642S1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108948D-S1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108948D-S1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (11-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (75-Y 23-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (75-Y 23-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 20107354D-EH1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1642EH1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Amendment by Delegate Ayala agreed to |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107354D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107354D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104491D |